SC H4779 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-8
Status: Introduced on March 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-8
Summary
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION TO REQUEST THAT THE DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION NAME THE PORTION OF GARNERS FERRY ROAD BEGINNING AT INTERSTATE 77 INTERCHANGE CONTINUING TO THE INTERSECTION OF PINEVIEW ROAD THE "CAPTAIN L. D. 'DOUG' BARDEN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY" AND ERECT APPROPRIATE MARKERS OR SIGNS ALONG THIS PORTION OF HIGHWAY THAT CONTAIN THE WORDS "CAPTAIN L. D. 'DOUG' BARDEN MEMORIAL HIGHWAY".
Title
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Portion Of Garners Ferry Road Beginning At Interstate 77 Interchange Continuing To The Intersection Of Pineview Road The "captain L. D. 'doug' Barden Memorial Highway" And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs Along This Portion Of Highway That Contain The Words "captain L. D. 'doug' Barden Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Bales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence SJ-8 | |
2010-04-29 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation SJ-8 | |
2010-04-27 | Referred to Committee on Transportation SJ-9 | |
2010-04-27 | Introduced SJ-9 | |
2010-04-22 | Adopted, sent to Senate HJ-86 | |
2010-04-21 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-2 | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-19 | |
2010-03-25 | Introduced HJ-19 |
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=4779&session=118 |