SC H4624 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-03 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide Up To A Five Thousand Dollar Credit For A Parent Or Guardian Who Teaches A Qualifying Student At Home For Instruction-related Expenses, To Provide Up To A Five Thousand Dollar Credit For A Parent For Tuition Paid To An Independent School On Behalf Of Their Child, And To Provide The Manner In Which The Credit May Be Claimed.
Title
Income tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Atwater |
2014-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Taylor |
2014-02-26 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Nanney |
2014-02-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: G.R.Smith |
2014-02-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Allison, Forrester, Tallon |
2014-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4624&session=120&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess120_2013-2014/prever/4624_20140206.htm |