SC H4605 | 2021-2022 | 124th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Crawford
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Crawford
Pending: House Education and Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 59-29-12 So As To Protect The Dignity And Rights Of All Individuals To Be Free From Ideological Coercion And Indoctrination In Places Of Learning, Childcare, And Employment That Receive, Or Benefit From, State Funds Or Accommodations, Directly Or Indirectly.
Title
Freedom from ideological coercion and indoctrination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Fry, Crawford |
2022-02-16 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, White |
2022-01-25 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: McCravy |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2021-11-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education and Public Works |
2021-11-17 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4605&session=124&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess124_2021-2022/prever/4605_20211117.htm |