SC H4561 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-26)
Status: Passed on June 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Act No. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-26)
Status: Passed on June 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Act No. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The South Carolina Department Of Natural Resources To Enter Into The Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Title
Interstate Boating Violator Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Adjourn Debate (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Act No. 178 | |
2014-05-27 | Effective date 05/16/14 | |
2014-05-16 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-15 | Ratified R 195 | |
2014-05-01 | House | Roll call Yeas-90 Nays-0 |
2014-05-01 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Fish, Game and Forestry |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Polled out of committee Fish, Game and Forestry |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2014-03-04 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: R.L.Brown |
2014-02-26 | House | Committee report: Favorable Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and read first time |