SC H4132 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read third time and sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Read third time and sent to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Approve Regulations Of The Department Of Transportation, Relating To Transportation Project Prioritization, Designated As Regulation Document Number 4683, Pursuant To The Provisions Of Article 1, Chapter 23, Title 1 Of The 1976 Code.
Title
Department of Transportation project prioritization (D. No. 4683)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - House: Passage Of Joint Resolution (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 14 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Roll call Yeas-96 Nays-3 |
2017-04-25 | House | Read second time |
2017-04-20 | House | Debate adjourned until Tues., 4-25-17 |
2017-04-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, placed on calendar without reference |