SC H4024 | 2011-2012 | 119th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [HTML]
Summary
Request That The Department Of Transportation Name The Intersection At Longtown Road And Clemson Road In Richland County In Memory Of David Dupre And Erect Appropriate Markers Or Signs At This Intersection That Contain The Words "david Dupre Intersection".
Title
David Dupre Intersection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence | |
2011-05-03 | Recalled from Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-14 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-04-14 | Introduced | |
2011-04-14 | Adopted, sent to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-05 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions | |
2011-04-05 | Introduced |