SC H3916 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize That Abuse And Neglect Of Children Is A Significant Problem, To Commend The Important Work Being Done To Combat This Serious Problem, And To Declare Tuesday, April 4, 2017, As "children's Advocacy Center Day" In South Carolina.
Title
Children's Advocacy Center Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable General |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |