SC H3809 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorize The Department Of Health And Human Services To Make Arrangements For All Medicaid Programs Offered Through Managed Care Plans Or Fee-for-service Programs To Require The Dispensing Of Contraceptive Drugs With A Twelve-month Supply Provided At One Time.
Title
Health insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 64 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Continue The Bill (Y: 32 N: 66 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Continue The Bill (Y: 32 N: 66 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Table Motion To Commit (Y: 61 N: 41 NV: 6 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Banking and Insurance |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2017-04-05 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Roll call Yeas-64 Nays-38 |
2017-04-04 | House | Read second time |
2017-03-29 | House | Requests for debate-Rep |
2017-03-29 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Knight |
2017-03-28 | House | Debate adjourned until Wed., 3-29-17 |
2017-03-28 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Huggins |
2017-03-23 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Dillard |
2017-02-22 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Clary |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and read first time |