SC H3660 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempt From Sales Tax Cannabis Sold By A Dispensary To A Cardholder; And To Repeal Article 4, Chapter 53, Title 44 Relating To Controlled Substances Therapeutic Research.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Compassionate Care Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jones
2019-01-24HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Henderson-Myers
2019-01-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hill
2019-01-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Garvin, W.Cox, Collins, Bernstein
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0366 (Similar To) 2019-01-15 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12362120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback