SC H3455 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Scrivener's error corrected
Pending: Senate Labor, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Require The Licensure Of Residential Swimming Pool Contractors, And To Revise The Scope Of Regulated Functions To Include Pool Foundations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractor licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 69 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.15 Printing (Y: 96 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20 Scrivener's error corrected
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced and read first time
2020-02-20HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2020-02-19HouseRoll call Yeas-69 Nays-45
2020-02-19HouseRead second time
2020-02-13HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Hixon
2020-01-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, R.Williams
2020-01-15HouseRequests for debate-Rep(s). Hill, Jones, Ballentine, Kimmons, Felder, Martin, Magnusson, Stavrinakis, Morgan, Haddon, Stringer, GR Smith, Fry, Whitmire, Yow, Long, VS Moss, Thayer, Forrester, Crawford, Clemmons, Bennett, and Oremus
2020-01-15HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: D.C.Moss
2019-05-01HouseDebate adjourned until Tues., 1-14-20
2019-05-01HouseAmended
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4011410(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback