RI S3139 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Quonset Development Corporation to establish a stormwater management and conveyance system and regulate connections, user fees, charges and assessments.
Title
Quonset Development Corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |