RI S3053 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for various changes to the jurisdiction, procedure, and administration of the Rhode Island workers' compensation court.
Title
Workers' Compensation - General Provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Fogarty [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. James Doyle [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |