RI S3001 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes South Kingstown to issue $4,000,000 bonds and notes to finance health, safety, fire code and roof repairs, renovations, improvements, landscaping, equipping and furnishing of the high school, middle schools and elementary schools.
Title
Authorizing The Town Of South Kingstown To Finance Health, Safety, Fire Code And Roof Repairs, Renovations, Improvements, Landscaping, Equipping And Furnishing Of The High School, Middle Schools And Elementary Schools In The Town, And All Attendant Expenses Including, But Not Limited To, Engineering And Architectural Costs By The Issuance Of Not More Than $4,000,000 Bonds, Notes And/or Other Evidences Of Indebtedness Therefor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/03/2014) |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |