RI S2973 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SOLEMNIZATION OF MARRIAGES - Allows the Honorable Gregory A. Mancini, Esq., to join Abigail Elizabeth Moretti and Jake Scott Owen in marriage on or about October 12, 2024, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Allows the Honorable Gregory A. Mancini, Esq., to join Abigail Elizabeth Moretti and Jake Scott Owen in marriage on or about October 12, 2024, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-05-07 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-26 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/25/2024) |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/23/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |