RI S2906 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the authorization for the town of Lincoln to establish municipal court (§ 45-2-51), and adopts an extensive authorization for the town of Lincoln to establish a municipal court – municipal housing court.
Title
General Powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-23 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |