RI S2896 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-14 - Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a premium payment program to help individuals and families transition from expired COVID-19 Medicaid coverage to commercial health insurance, thereby avoiding a gap in medical coverage.
Title
Rhode Island Health Benefit Exchange
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2022) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2022) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |