RI S2845 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-16 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Ri - Part 3 -- Health And Safety -- Fire Safety Code (would Delete The Provisions Of The General Laws Which Would Require That Plans For The Erection And Alteration Of A Building Must Be Approved By The State Fire Marshal If Prepared By A Professional Engineer Or Architect)
Title
An Act Relating To Making It Easier To Do Business In Ri - Part 3 -- Health And Safety -- Fire Safety Code (would Delete The Provisions Of The General Laws Which Would Require That Plans For The Erection And Alteration Of A Building Must Be Approved By The State Fire Marshal If Prepared By A Professional Engineer Or Architect)
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Connors [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. William Walaska [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | House passed Sub B | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub B | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-20 | Referred to House Committee on Small Business | |
2010-05-20 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-18 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-13 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-13 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-06 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-06 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2845.pdf |