RI S2841 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a mortgagee from requiring an entity with 501(c)(3) tax exempt status to file an affidavit limiting ownership or occupancy of residential property.
Title
Mortgage Foreclosure And Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-09 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/09/2016) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/26/2016) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |