RI S2833 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibit insurance companies from requiring the use of used or remanufactured airbags and/or suspension parts when vehicle repairs are made by an auto body shop.
Title
Unfair Claims Settlement Facilities Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2833.pdf |