RI S2819 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers -- Contracting Standard For Renewable Energy (authorize Narragansett Electric To Enter Into Agreement With State's Preferred Developer Of Offshore Wind For Purchase Of Energy/capacity/environmental/market Attributes As Long As Provisions Of The General Laws Pertaining To Town Of New Shoreham Project)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Utilities And Carriers -- Contracting Standard For Renewable Energy (authorize Narragansett Electric To Enter Into Agreement With State's Preferred Developer Of Offshore Wind For Purchase Of Energy/capacity/environmental/market Attributes As Long As Provisions Of The General Laws Pertaining To Town Of New Shoreham Project)
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-06-10 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-06-08 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-08 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2010-06-08 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-11 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-05 | Committee heard | |
2010-05-05 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-28 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2819.pdf |