RI S2799 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Potential Improvements To Processing Municipal Real Estate Tax Appeals (would Create A 12 Member Senate Commission To Study Potential Improvements To Processing Municipal Tax Real Estate Appeals, And Who Would Report Back Before January 15, 2015.)
Title
Senate Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Potential Improvements To Processing Municipal Real Estate Tax Appeals (would Create A 12 Member Senate Commission To Study Potential Improvements To Processing Municipal Tax Real Estate Appeals, And Who Would Report Back Before January 15, 2015.)
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] |
Sen. Dawson Hodgson [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |