RI S2760 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the RI Real Estate Time-Share Act to provide for dissolution of the time-share form of ownership by fewer than 60% of the owners in certain circumstances.
Title
Rhode Island Real Estate Time-share Act - Termination Of Time Shares
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub B |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for reconsideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee transferred to House Judiciary |
2016-06-17 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |