RI S2758 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that ยง 34-7-4 ("right of footway denied") applies only to private rights of footway.
Title
By Possession And Prescription
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. James Seveney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2758.pdf |