RI S2754 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide minimum mandatory sentences for certain quantities of synthetic drugs.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 67 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-05 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/20/2014) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |