RI S2750 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the Rhode Island Underground Storage Tank financial advisory board and include the cleanup of residential heating oil tanks under the eligibility for reimbursement from the cleanup fund.
Title
Rhode Island Underground Storage Tank Financial Responsibility Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2022) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |