RI S2749 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the definitions of a "Pupil Transportation Vehicle" to be and constructed to seat not more than ten (10) passengers including the operator, rather than the existing limit of eight (8) passengers.
Title
Pupil Transportation Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2749.pdf |