RI S2749 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it unlawful for a person to own or operate a business in the town of Smithfield without a registration certificate from the town.
Title
General Powers -- Authorizing The Town Of Smithfield To Impose A Business Registration Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |