RI S2737 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-26 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the revenue decoupling reconciliation mechanism used by a gas distribution company for the purposes of revenue decoupling to not require that distribution be determined on a revenue-per-customer basis.
Title
Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2022) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |