RI S2723 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - Referred to House Health & Human Services
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND HEALTH CARE REFORM ACT OF 2004 -- HEALTH INSURANCE OVERSIGHT - Includes the definition of "primary care services" and requires that all biennial reports shall include a review and recommendation of rates for primary care services on and after September 1, 2025.
Title
Includes the definition of "primary care services" and requires that all biennial reports shall include a review and recommendation of rates for primary care services on and after September 1, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | House | Referred to House Health & Human Services |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2024) |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
State Affairs And Government
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND HEALTH CARE REFORM ACT OF 2004
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND HEALTH CARE REFORM ACT OF 2004 -- HEALTH INSURANCE OVERSIGHT
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND HEALTH CARE REFORM ACT OF 2004
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- THE RHODE ISLAND HEALTH CARE REFORM ACT OF 2004 -- HEALTH INSURANCE OVERSIGHT