RI S2712 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires firefighter applicants to undergo state and federal criminal background checks and fingerprinting prior to hire. Fingerprint records would be destroyed after the completion of the background check.
Title
General Provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/15/2014) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/18/2014) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |