RI S2707 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employers with 5 or more persons with developmental disabilities to pay employees no less than $15.00/hr and to have state and general revenue/federal funds appropriated to BHDDH programs to adjust minimum wage increase.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2707.pdf |