RI S2694 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - House passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-06 - House passed Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes (would Create A Special Legislative Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study Of Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes)
Title
Joint Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes (would Create A Special Legislative Commission Whose Purpose It Would Be To Make A Comprehensive Study Of Rhode Island's Minimum Pricing Statutes)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-05 | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2012) | |
2012-06-04 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2012-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2012) | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to House Finance | |
2012-05-23 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2012-05-17 | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2012) | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2012-05-16 | Committee recommended indefinite postponement | |
2012-05-14 | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2012) | |
2012-04-11 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-03-22 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2694.pdf |