RI S2672 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local tax assessors to assess valuations on a yearly basis pursuant to chapter 4 of title 44, section one, and to adjust the valuation of assessed properties on a yearly basis pursuant thereto.
Title
Levy And Assessment Of Local Taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee heard |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2020) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2672.pdf |