RI S2671 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Entitle airport corporation rescue and firefighters to obtain injured in the line of duty benefits, if so qualified and would include injuries sustained while performing services for the executive military staff
Title
Injured Airport Firefighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2671.pdf |