RI S2658 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts the gross receipts of nonprofit municipal government employee associations from the sales and use taxation.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes - Liability And Computation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/01/2018) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2658.pdf |