RI S2639 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Opticians (would Eliminate The Prohibition On The Selling And Replacing Of Contact Lenses Within The Definition Of The Practice Of Opticianry)
Title
An Act Relating To Businesses And Professions -- Opticians (would Eliminate The Prohibition On The Selling And Replacing Of Contact Lenses Within The Definition Of The Practice Of Opticianry)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2012) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2639.pdf |