RI S2627 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the state bureau of audits, with the DOA directors approval to issue subpoena for the production of documents and records needed by the audit.
Title
Bureau Of Audits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2014) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2014) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2627.pdf |