RI S2599 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $738,088 To Rhode Island College (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $738,088 To Rhode Island College To Fund Rhode Island College Hsi Status And Students Supports.)
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING AN APPROPRIATION OF $738,088 TO RHODE ISLAND COLLEGE (This resolution would authorize the appropriation of the sum of $738,088 to Rhode Island College to fund Rhode Island College HSI status and students supports.)
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cano [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2599.pdf |