RI S2598 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that for the purpose of determining income limitations for receiving general public assistance, child support that is in arrears for thirty (30) days or more would not be considered to be income.
Title
Relating To Human Services-public Assistance
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2598.pdf |