RI S2576 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Calls for the promulgation of rules and regulations which require public higher education institutions financially compensate students who participate in work-based learning experiences.
Title
Council On Postsecondary Education
Sponsors
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2576.pdf |