RI S2547 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CAPITAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM -- 2024 BOND REFERENDA - Submits 2024 capital development program requesting the issuance of $100,000,000 in general obligation bonds to the voters for approval at the November 8, 2024, general election.
Title
Submits 2024 capital development program requesting the issuance of $100,000,000 in general obligation bonds to the voters for approval at the November 8, 2024, general election.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2547.pdf |