RI S2546 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Empowers a justice of the peace to receive from an arresting agency, notice of violation of probation or bail that has been received from the attorney general and present the notice to the arrestee.
Title
Preliminary Proceedings In District Courts
Sponsors
Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/02/2016) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |