RI S2544 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers the jurisdiction of possession of one ounce (1 oz.) or less of marijuana by a person who is under the age of seventeen (17) years from the Rhode Island Traffic Tribunal to the Rhode Island Family Court.
Title
Relating To Delinquent And Dependent Children-food And Drugs-uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-03 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2016) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |