RI S2543 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES -- LEAD BY EXAMPLE ACT - Bans state purchases of plastic bottles and also requires state funds to be used to lease or purchase electric vehicles and renewable energy efficient technologies for use on state property.
Title
Bans state purchases of plastic bottles and also requires state funds to be used to lease or purchase electric vehicles and renewable energy efficient technologies for use on state property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Public Property And Works
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES -- LEAD BY EXAMPLE ACT
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- STATE PURCHASES -- LEAD BY EXAMPLE ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2543.pdf |