RI S2539 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows persons honorably discharged from the military or members of the National Guard to use acquired classroom and workplace training towards apprenticeship requirements for certain skilled trades.
Title
Apprenticeship Programs In Trade And Industry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2014) |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |