RI S2536 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds mental health and substance abuse treatment providers and facilities to those entities that health insurers are required to audit or review within 18 months of initial payment.
Title
Accident And Sickness Insurance Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |