RI S2513 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the secretary of state to establish a system for the electronic registration of voters. The act would limit the use or transfer of the information supplied by the voter in registering.
Title
Registration Of Voters
Sponsors
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Registration of voters approval of amendment lc 003757/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Registration of voters approval of amendment lc 003757/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2016-03-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-22 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/22/2016) |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |