RI S2499 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Joyously Celebrating The 100th Birthday Of Ms. Dorabelle Smith On February 21, 2022, And Thanking Her For Her Service To Our Nation
Title
Senate Resolution Joyously Celebrating The 100th Birthday Of Ms. Dorabelle Smith On February 21, 2022, And Thanking Her For Her Service To Our Nation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/08/2022) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2499.pdf |