RI S2480 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides the standards for reviewing applications for plans or work for the extension of supply or distribution mains or pipes. It also adds an appeal of a denial by a public water supply facility pursuant to the administrative procedures act ยง 42-35-15.
Title
Water Resources Management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-07 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 64 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-07 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2022-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2022) |
2022-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2022-05-27 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-26 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/24/2022) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2022) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |