RI S2469 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-15 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires hospital and ambulatory surgical facility operating rooms to have at least one circulating nurse present in each operating room during each surgical procedure.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities -- Circulating Nurses
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. James Doyle [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Facilities - circulating nurses approval of amendment lc 004647/2 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-15 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-27 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/26/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2016) |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |